EP1295237 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COORDINATING SEVERAL TYPES OF THERAPY AND THERAPY PROVIDERS INVOLVED IN THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauer, Karl-Heinz Im Schwizergut 25 8610 Uster / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Bauer, Karl-Heinz IM Schwizergut 25 8610 Uster / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Lucht, Silvia Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Lucht, Silvia Patentanwälte Geitz, Truckenmüller, Lucht Kaiser-Joseph-Strasse 260 79098 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00943535.5 | 28.04.2000 | [2003/13] | WO2000DE01337 | Priority number, date | DE1999119829 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19919829 | [2003/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0067188 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295237 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
G16H80/00 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOORDINIERUNG MEHRERER AN EINER BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN BETEILIGTER THERAPIEARTEN UND THERAPIEPARTNER | [2003/13] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COORDINATING SEVERAL TYPES OF THERAPY AND THERAPY PROVIDERS INVOLVED IN THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS | [2003/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COORDONNER PLUSIEURS TYPES DE THERAPIE ET PARTENAIRES DE THERAPIE IMPLIQUES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE PATIENTS | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/06] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | 05.12.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.12.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9322735 (PACING MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANC [NL], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 36 *; | [XA]US5713350 (YOKOTA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 6,7 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 50 * [A] 1-5; | [A]US5786816 (MACRAE KENNETH I [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 54 *; | [XA]US5842175 (ANDROS TODD [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 4 - column 3, line 53 * [A] 2-5; | [A]WO9901837 (PSYCHOLOGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,6* page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 4 * |