EP1169039 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION COMPRISING AMOXYCILLIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beecham Pharmaceuticals (Pte) Limited 38 Quality Road, Jurong Industrial Estate, Jurong Singapore 618809 / SG | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONLEY, Creighton P., SmithKline Beecham Bristol Industrial Park, Weaver Pike Bristol, TN 37620 / US | 02 /
ROUSH, John A., SmithKline Beecham Bristol Industrial Park, Weaver Pike Bristol, TN 37620 / US | 03 /
STORM, Kevin H., SmithKline Beecham Bristol Industrial Park, Weaver Pike Bristol, TN 37620 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Connell, Anthony Christopher GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Connell, Anthony Christopher GlaxoSmithKline, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00944141.1 | 11.04.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000IB00979 | Priority number, date | US19990129074P | 13.04.1999 Original published format: US 129074 P | US19990150727P | 25.08.1999 Original published format: US 150727 P | US19990159813P | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 159813 P | US19990159838P | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 159838 P | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0061115 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1169039 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/43, A61K9/20, A61P31/04 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/43 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 02.10.2001 | Title | German: | AMOXICILLIN ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG | [2002/02] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION COMPRISING AMOXYCILLIN | [2002/02] | French: | NOUVELLE METHODE DE TRAITEMENT | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9219227 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 11,12,14,15 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 15; example 12 *; | [X]WO9533487 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FARMA [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * page 4, line 2 - line 28 * * page 5, line 27 - line 36 * * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 15 *; | [XD]WO9709042 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [XD] 11-15 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 10 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 37 * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 15; example 2 *; | [A]WO9835672 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM LAB [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 16 - line 24 ** page 21 - page 22; example 10 *; | [PX]WO0012088 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1-6,15 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 17 * * page 12, line 6 - line 32 * * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 2; example 2 * * claims 1,2,7 * |