EP1211341 - WELT-SEAMING METHOD EXCELLENT IN STRETCHABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd. 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641-8511 / JP | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Shima Seiki Mfg., Ltd 85 Sakata Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okayama, Yasutaka 406, Syaruman Fuji Sonobe 416-4, Sonobe Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8483 / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00944297.1 | 05.07.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000JP04504 | Priority number, date | JP19990199128 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19912899 | [2002/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104398 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211341 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211341 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04B7/10, D04B7/22, D04B1/06 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
D04B1/24 (EP,US);
D04B7/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NÄHEN VON EINEM SAUM MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER DEHNBARKEIT | [2002/23] | English: | WELT-SEAMING METHOD EXCELLENT IN STRETCHABILITY | [2002/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE COUTURE D'OURLETS AVEC UNE EXCELLENTE APTITUDE A L'ETIRAGE | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | Translation filed | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/31] | FR | 02.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19654510 (STOLL & CO H [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0468687 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 52; figures 2,3; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH10204759 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG); | [A]JPH09310254 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG); | [A]JPH10245751 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG); | [A]US4548057 (ESSIG KARL [DE]) |