EP1120671 - DISPERSION SHIFT OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome, Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Shoichiro, Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
TANIGAWA, Shoji, Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00944393.8 | 11.07.2000 | [2001/31] | WO2000JP04620 | Priority number, date | JP19990198242 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19824299 | JP19990198243 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19824399 | JP19990205450 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20545099 | [2001/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104675 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120671 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/22, G02B6/16 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
G02B6/03666 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
G02B6/02238 (EP,US);
G02B6/03611 (EP,US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,US);
G02B6/03644 (EP,US);
G02B6/0365 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPERSIONSVERSCHOBENE OPTISCHE FASER | [2001/31] | English: | DISPERSION SHIFT OPTICAL FIBER | [2001/31] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE A DISPERSION DECALEE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2001 | Translation filed | 07.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5675688 (NOUCHI PASCALE [FR], et al) [A] 1,10-12 * figure 2; examples 2,3 *; | [X]WO9912064 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 5,6; example 2 *; | [A]WO9918461 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 15-21 * figure 6; example 3 *; | [X]WO9922257 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 1; table 1 *; | [PXL]EP0949517 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PXL] 1-9 * figures 5,6; example 2 *; | [L]EP1020741 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP])[L] 15-21 | International search | [Y]US5684909 (LIU YANMING [US]); | [X]EP0859247 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]JPH10246830 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [X]JPH11167038 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]EP0959374 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X] - MASAAKI HIRANO ET AL., "Teibunsan slope ring core gata bunsan shift fiber", PROCEEDINGS OF GENERAL MEETING IN 1998, THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, ELECTRONICS 1, (19980306), page 223, XP002946568 | [A] - BHAGAVATULA V.A. ET AL., "Dispersion-shifted single-mode fiber for-bit-rate and multiwavelength systems", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE, OFC'95, TECHNICAL DIGEST, THH1, (1995), pages 259 - 260, XP002932570 | [A] - NOUCHI P. ET AL., "New dispersion shifted fiber with effective area larger than 90 mum2", 22ND EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION-ECOC'96, PROCEEDINGS, OSLO, NORWAY, (19960915), vol. 1, MOB.3.2., pages 1.49 - 1.52, XP002932571 | [A] - NOUCHI P., "Maximum effective area for non-zero dispersion-shifted fiber", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE, OFC'98, TECHNICAL DIGEST, THK3, SAN JOSE, CALIFORNIA, (19980222), pages 303 - 304, XP002932572 | [A] - HIMENO K. ET AL., "Splice loss of large effective area fiber and its reduction by mode field conversion", 23RD EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION-ECOC'97, PROCEEDINGS, (19970922), vol. 1, pages 131 - 134, XP002932573 | [A] - LIU Y. ET AL., "Single-mode dispersin-shifted fibers with effective area over 100 mum2", 24TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION-ECOC'98, PROCEEDINGS, MADRID, SPAIN, (19980920), vol. 1, pages 41 - 42, XP002932574 | [A] - BELOV A.V., "Profile structure of single-mode fibers with low nonlinear properties for long-haul communication lines", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (19990315), vol. 161, pages 212 - 216, XP002932576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(99)00049-8 |