EP1114677 - AUTOMATIC PAINTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB K.K. 26-1, Sakuragaokacho, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8512 / JP | [2008/21] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states ABB K.K. 26-1, Sakuragaokacho, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8512 / JP | ||
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states ABB K.K. 2-39, Akasaka 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Hidetsugu 302, Urban City Ogawa 13-13, Ekimae 1-chome Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0034 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Osamu 27-9, Ohmoriminami 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-0013 / JP | 03 /
HOSODA, Toshio 20-3, Ekimae 2-chome Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0034 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Yoshiyuki 459, Ohaza Yada Kuwana-shi Mie 511-0821 / JP | 05 /
ARICHI, Akihiko 2-1, Aza Tohsendai Ohaza Ogawa Higashiuramachi Chita-gun Aichi 470-2102 / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00944411.8 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/28] | WO2000JP04676 | Priority number, date | JP19990199551 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19955199 | [2001/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103852 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114677 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114677 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B05B12/00, B05B12/14, B05B5/04 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B05B3/1042 (EP,KR,US);
B05B1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/1463 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/1472 (EP,KR,US);
B05B13/0431 (EP,KR,US);
B05B13/0452 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/62 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/65 (EP,KR,US);
B05B3/1064 (EP,KR,US);
B05B3/1092 (EP,KR,US);
B05B5/0407 (EP,KR,US);
B05B5/0415 (EP,KR,US);
B05B5/0422 (EP,KR,US);
B05B5/0426 (EP,KR,US);
B05B12/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE FARBAUFTRAGSVORRICHTUNG | [2001/28] | English: | AUTOMATIC PAINTING DEVICE | [2001/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PEINTURE AUTOMATIQUE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2001 | Translation filed | 15.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4944459 (WATANABE TAKASHI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH01168379 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [A]JPH08229446 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]EP0850693 (ABB INDUSTRY K K [JP]) | by applicant | JPS60122071 | JPS63175662 | JPH0483549 | JPH08229446 |