EP1200536 - RARE EARTH DOPED HOST MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University Old Queens, Somerset Street New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University Old Queens, Somerset Street New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIMAN, Richard, E. 10 Monroe Avenue Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
BALLATO, John 811 Issaquenna Trail, Apt. 1802 Central, SC 29630 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Schmidt, Karsten, et al Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 00944575.0 | 25.02.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US04919 | Priority number, date | US19990272912 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 272912 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056837 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200536 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/08, C09K11/61, C09K11/88, H01J1/63, C09K11/85, C09K11/86 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C09K11/777 (EP,KR,US);
B82B1/00 (KR);
C09K11/7701 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7704 (EP,US);
C09K11/7705 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7767 (EP,US);
C09K11/7773 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | C09K11/59, C09K11/08, C09K11/61, C09K11/88, C09K11/62, H01J1/63 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELTENERD DOTIERTE WIRTSMATERIALIEN | [2002/18] | English: | RARE EARTH DOPED HOST MATERIALS | [2002/18] | French: | MATERIAUX HOTES DOPES AUX TERRES RARES | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 09.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 23.12.2009 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2013 | 28.02.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3233189 (GUGGENHEIM HOWARD J, et al) [Y] 1-5,18-22 * column 3, line 7 - line 21 * * column 4, line 18 - line 44 *; | [A]US4099089 (RABATIN JACOB G) [A] 1-5,18-22* column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 31 *; | [XA]US5013534 (DISSAUX ANTOINE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 38 * * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 10 * [A] 12,13; | [Y]EP0798361 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-5,18-22 * page 2, line 21 - line 29 * * page 3, line 13 - line 50 *; | [X]EP0859372 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 10,11 * page 6, line 23 - line 35 * * page 7, line 19 - line 23 * | International search | [Y]US3233189 (GUGGENHEIM HOWARD J, et al); | [X]US3397316 (BROWN MICHAEL R, et al); | [X]US3801702 (DONOHUE P); | [Y]US3836784 (BATES C, et al); | [Y]US3872309 (DE BELDER MAURICE HECTOR, et al); | [X]US4239968 (EGUCHI SYUSAKU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5013534 (DISSAUX ANTOINE [FR], et al); | [X]US5541012 (OHWAKI JUNICHI [JP], et al) |