EP1200073 - SELECTIVE iGluR 5? RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MIGRAINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEAKMAN, David 720 Eagle Creek Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 02 /
CHAPPELL, Amy Suzon 9040 Woodacre Boulevard, South Drive Indianapolis, IN 46234 / US | 03 /
FILLA, Sandra, Ann 1680 Williamsburg Lane Franklin, IN 46131 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Kirk, Willis 1177 Helford Lane Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
ORNSTEIN, Paul, Leslie 10441 Bosahan Court Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Suarez-Miles, Ana Sanchiz, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Kingsbury, Oliver William, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Pritchard, Judith, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00944671.7 | 27.06.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US16297 | Priority number, date | US19990142485P | 06.07.1999 Original published format: US 142485 P | US19990151165P | 27.08.1999 Original published format: US 151165 P | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0101972 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1200073 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200073 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/4725, A61K31/472, A61K31/5377, C07D401/06, C07D413/06, A61P25/06 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/4725 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/472 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | 06.06.2002 | LT | 06.06.2002 | LV | 06.06.2002 | MK | 06.06.2002 | RO | 06.06.2002 | SI | 06.06.2002 | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE IGLUR5 REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER MIGRÄNE | [2002/18] | English: | SELECTIVE iGluR 5? RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MIGRAINE | [2002/18] | French: | ANTAGONISTES SELECTIFS DU RECEPTEUR iGluR 5? UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MIGRAINE | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 18.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5356902 (ORNSTEIN PAUL L [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * column 3 * * column 5, line 10 - line 30 *; | [YD]US5670516 (ARNOLD M BRIAN [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12,13 * column 2 * * column 3, line 40 * * column 7, line 21 - line 27 * * see column 45 compounds 7-9 *; | [A]US5767117 (MOSKOWITZ MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 8 * column A * * column 3, line 59 - line 67 ** column 4, line 1 - line 9 *; | [YDA]WO9845270 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 3,11; | [E]WO0102367 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [E] 1-3,9-11 * the whole document *; | [Y] - PROCTER ET AL, "Possible role of GluR5 glutamate receptors in spinal nociceptive processing in the anaesthetized rat", JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY,XX,XX, (199711), vol. 504P, ISSN 0022-3751, pages 101P - 102P, XP002108296 [Y] 1,4,9,10,12 * the whole document * | [Y] - NIKAM ET AL., "The search for AMPA/Gly(N) receptor antagonists", DRUGS FUTURE, (1999), vol. 24, no. 10, pages 1107 - 1124, XP000997758 [Y] 1,4,5,9,10,12,13 * page 1109, column R * * page 1110, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.1999.024.10.858631 | [YA] - O'NEILL MJ ET AL, "Decahydroisoquinolines: novel competitive AMPA/kainate antagonists with neuroprotective effects in global cerebral ischaemia.", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, OCT-NOV 1998, 37 (10-11) P1211-22, ENGLAND, XP000997636 [Y] 1,4,5,9,10,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0028-3908(98)00134-8 | [YA] - PROCTER MJ ET AL, "Actions of kainate and AMPA selective glutamate receptor ligands on nociceptive processing in the spinal cord.", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, OCT-NOV 1998, 37 (10-11) P1287-97, ENGLAND, XP000997628 [Y] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 3,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0028-3908(98)00136-1 | [A] - BLEAKMAN D., "Kainate receptor pharmacology and physiology", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES_(_CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI._), 56/7-8 (558-566), Switzerland, XP000990931 [A] 1,9,10 * page 559, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 562, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000180050453 | [YDA] - SIMMONS RM ET AL, "Kainate GluR5 receptor subtype mediates the nociceptive response to formalin in the rat.", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, 1998, 37 (1) P25-36, ENGLAND, XP000997629 [YD] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 3,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0028-3908(97)00188-3 | [A] - MITSIKOSTAS DD ET AL, "Non-NMDA glutamate receptors modulate capsaicin induced c-fos expression within trigeminal nucleus caudalis.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, Database accession no. 10003939, URL: DIALOG, XP002165715 [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * | [ ] - BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, JUN 1999, 127 (3) P623-30, ENGLAND |