Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0101690 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015312640 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US201514729720 | 03.06.2015 | US45710203 | 06.06.2003 | US21287308 | 18.09.2008 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | US201313933592 | 02.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9173003 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2015 | B2 | US2014047476 | 13.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | US201314060222 | 22.10.2013 | US55995509 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9071879 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2015 | B2 | US2014040942 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US45710203 | 06.06.2003 | US21287308 | 18.09.2008 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | US201313933592 | 02.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010192179 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US45710203 | 06.06.2003 | US75103710 | 31.03.2010 | US21287308 | 18.09.2008 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8589978 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2010115559 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | US55995509 | 15.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8505049 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2013 | B2 | US2009019485 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US45710203 | 06.06.2003 | US21287308 | 18.09.2008 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004117831 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US45710203 | 06.06.2003 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4743738B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2011 | B2 | JP2003503911 | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003503907 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US0017590 | 27.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1377059 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | EP00944975 | 28.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1197086 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2003 | B1 | EP1197086 | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2820780 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | C | CA2820780 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | CA2378304 | 28.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU768383B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2003 | B2 | AU5898300 | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5892300 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US0017590 | 27.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1197075 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US0017590 | 27.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR026133 | 29.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR029372 | 25.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE247360T | 15.08.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0012053 | 21.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2377941 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US0017590 | 27.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2378304 | 08.04.2014 | C | CA2378304 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1180626C | 15.12.2004 | C | CN1365573 | 21.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60004530T | 24.06.2004 | T2 | DE60004530D1 | 18.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2204647T | 01.05.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1045427 | 22.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02000484 | 02.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017840 | 28.06.2000 | US14469599 | 20.07.1999 | US60568300 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW484313B | 21.04.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0101677 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1371571 | 25.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US60447000 | 26.06.2000 | US14150199 | 28.06.1999 |