EP1198903 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING FREQUENCY DIVERSITY TO SEPARATE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lot 41 Acquisition Foundation, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2010/23] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Shattil, Steven J. 4980 Meredith Way No. 201 Boulder, CO 80303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00945050.3 | 30.06.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US18113 | Priority number, date | US19990347182 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: US 347182 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103330 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198903 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198903 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H04L5/026 (EP);
H04B7/02 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP);
H04L5/06 (EP);
H04B1/707 (EP);
H04B7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG VON SIGNALEN IN DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION DURCH FREQUENZ-DIVERSITÄT | [2002/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING FREQUENCY DIVERSITY TO SEPARATE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SIGNALS | [2002/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'UTILISER LA DIVERSITE DE FREQUENCE POUR SEPARER DES SIGNAUX DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2004 | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | IE | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | LU | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5528581 (BOT PAULUS GEORGE MARIA DE [NL]) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 28; figure 5 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 3; figure 6 ** column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 4; figure 7 *; | [DXAY]US5828658 (OTTERSTEN BJOERN E [SE], et al) [DX] 27,30,36-38,41,43-46 * column 6, line 13 - line 51 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 63 * * column 15, line 37 - column 16, line 13; figures 5,6 * * column 21, line 48 - line 53 * * column 25, line 60 - column 26, line 10 * [A] 1,10-13,39,40,42 [Y] 15,20-25; | [XY] - XU W ET AL, "ON THE PERFORMANCE OF MULTICARRIER RAKE SYSTEMS", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, pages 295 - 299, XP000737553 [X] 1-13,16,17,19,27-29,31-46 * abstract * * page 295, column R, line 1 - page 297, column L, paragraph 2 * [Y] 15,20-25 | [XA] - WEERACKODY V, "DIVERSITY FOR THE DIRECT-SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEM USING MULTIPLE TRANSMIT ANTENNAS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930523), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 1775 - 1779, XP000448429 [X] 27,30,36-38,41,43-46 * abstract * * page 1775, column L, line 31 - line 52 * * page 1776, column R, line 38 - line 54 * [A] 1,15,16,19-25,39,40,42 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397586 | by applicant | US5437055 | US5504783 | US5513176 | US5515378 | US5519692 | US5528581 | US5563906 | US5577265 | US5592490 | US5625880 | US5642353 | US5671168 | US5828658 | US6008760 |