EP1235691 - BUSINESS CARD TO RETRIEVE ASSOCIATED WEB PAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Katic, Boris 19 Antill Crescent Baulkham Hills, NSW 2153 / AU | For all designated states Modica, Gary 19 Antill Crescent Baulkham, NSW 2153 / AU | For all designated states Link, Andrew 19 Antill Crescent Baulkham, NSW 2153 / AU | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00945459.6 | 26.07.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000AU00890 | Priority number, date | AU19990042478 | 04.08.1999 Original published format: AU 4247899 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110653 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235691 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, G06F3/08, B42D15/02 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
B42D15/02 (EP);
G06F16/955 (EP);
G06Q20/342 (EP);
G06Q20/346 (EP);
G07F7/025 (EP);
H04M17/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | B42D15/10, G06F3/08, G06K19/067, G07F7/08, H04M17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VISITENKARTE ZUM WIEDERAUFFINDEN VON DIE ZUGEORDNETE WEB-SEITE | [2002/36] | English: | BUSINESS CARD TO RETRIEVE ASSOCIATED WEB PAGE | [2002/36] | French: | CARTE DE VISITE PROFESSIONNELLE DONNANT ACCES A UNE PAGE WEB QUI LUI EST ASSOCIEE | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | 14.05.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.05.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   15.05.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2002 | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2004 | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]GB2295939 ; | [X]WO9701137 ; | [X]FR2737797 ; | [X]US5640193 ; | [X]JPH09204389 ; | [X]DE29711078U ; | [X]US5804803 ; | [X]WO9840823 ; | [X]WO9857474 ; | [X]WO9909519 ; | [X]US5903729 ; | [XP]BE1011859 ; | [XP]US6012102 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP09204389 A 19970805 (SNONY CORP) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1998-054118/06, & DE29711078U U 19980102 (BUESCH) | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2000-224932/20, & BE1011859 A6 20000201 (ROBERT ET AL.) |