EP1109495 - EXTENDED FIELD OF VIEW ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISSLER, Thomas, M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
OLSSON, Lars, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PETERSON, Roy, B. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | Lottin, Claudine Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00945824.1 | 26.06.2000 | [2001/26] | WO2000EP05910 | Priority number, date | US19990345243 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: US 345243 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101861 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109495 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/08, G01S15/89 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
G01S7/52074 (EP,US);
G01S7/52036 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/543 (EP,US);
G01S7/5206 (EP,US);
G01S7/52071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL- DIAGNOSTIK- BILDERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM MIT ERWEITERTEN SICHTFELD | [2001/26] | English: | EXTENDED FIELD OF VIEW ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SYSTEM | [2001/26] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE DE DIAGNOSTIC ULTRASONORE A CHAMP DE VISION ETENDU | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5566674 (WENG LEE [US]) [DA] 15-17,19 * column 3, line 11 - line 36 * * column 4, line 6 - column 10, line 34; tables 1-6 *; | [A]US5645066 (GANDINI REBECCA L [US], et al) [A] 8-11 * column 2, line 16 - line 44 * * column 3, line 1 - column 8, line 33; tables 1-6 *; | [A]US5671745 (PARK YONG-HEON [KR], et al) [A] 2-4 * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 41; table 2 *; | [A]US5782766 (WENG LEE [US], et al) [A] 1,5-11,15 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 62; table 2 *; | [A]US5899861 (FRIEMEL BARRY H [US], et al) [A] 1,5-11,15 * column 13, line 28 - line 59 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 51 * * column 5, line 24 - column 10, line 54; tables 1-7 *; | [PA]WO0024316 (ACUSON [US]) [PA] 10,11,15-18,20-24* page 13, line 30 - page 28, line 5; tables 1-13 * |