EP1299311 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING INDUSTRIAL EFFLUENTS TO ELIMINATE ORGANIC AND/OR MINERAL POLLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lacaze S.A. Zone Industrielle, Boite postale 2 46120 Leyme / FR | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Lacaze S.A. Zone Industrielle, Boite postale 2 46120 Leyme / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Lacaze S.A. Zone Industrielle, Boite postale 2 46120 Leyme / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAZE, Pierre Lotissement Pré Grand F-46120 Leyme / FR | [2003/15] | Application number, filing date | 00946013.0 | 23.06.2000 | [2003/15] | WO2000FR01777 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198213 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299311 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299311 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C02F1/4672 (EP);
C02F1/461 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON INDUSTRIELLEN ABWÄSSERN ZUR BESEITIGUNG DER ORGANISCHEN VERSCHMUTZUNG | [2003/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING INDUSTRIAL EFFLUENTS TO ELIMINATE ORGANIC AND/OR MINERAL POLLUTION | [2003/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'EFFLUENTS INDUSTRIELS EN VUE DE L'ELIMINATION DE LA POLLUTION ORGANIQUE ET/OU MINERALE | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 03.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.09.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | [2005/18] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3703453 (GORDY JOHN, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2240892 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 27 *; | [A]FR2513662 (CHEVRON RES [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4752364 (DHOOGE PATRICK M [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0297738 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5516972 (FARMER JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]FR2792307 (JULIEN LACAZE [FR]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document * |