EP1196835 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURE DISTRIBUTION OF DIGITAL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simmons, Douglas Manning 2F, No. 6, Lane 120, Sec 1, Hsin Sheng S. Road Taipei 100 / TW | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 18 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00946059.3 | 07.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000GB02622 | Priority number, date | GB19990016212 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916212 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104729 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196835 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/10] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN VERTEILUNG VON DIGITALEN PRODUKTEN | [2002/16] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURE DISTRIBUTION OF DIGITAL PRODUCTS | [2002/16] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION SECURISEE DE PRODUITS NUMERIQUES | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5761485 (MUNYAN DANIEL E [US]) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * column 7, line 33 - line 58 * * column 14, line 33 - line 65 *; | [XAY]WO9842098 (CRYPTOWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12,17-19,23 * abstract * * page 11, line 18 - line 29 * * page 13, line 8 - page 21, line 33 * * page 25, line 16 - page 26, line 28 * * page 27, line 21 - page 29, line 6 * [A] 4,5,8,9,20-22,24,25 [Y] 10,13,14,26; | [Y]WO9858306 (TECHWAVE INC [US], et al) [Y] 10,26 * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 2 * * page 17, line 19 - page 18, line 18 * * page 21, line 3 - page 23, line 13 ** page 33, line 27 - page 34, line 23 * |