Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP1196375 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00946121 GB0002740W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1196375Global Dossier 12.05.2004B1
EP1196375 17.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
GB0002740 17.07.2000
GB9916575 15.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ATE266627T 15.05.2004T1
Priority number Date
GB0002740 17.07.2000
GB9916575 15.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60010705T 19.05.2005T2
DE60010705D1 17.06.2004D1
Priority number Date
GB0002740 17.07.2000
GB9916575 15.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6664410 16.12.2003B1
Priority number Date
GB0002740 17.07.2000
GB9916575 15.07.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0105747Global Dossier 25.01.2001A1
Priority number Date
GB9916575 15.07.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9916575D0 15.09.1999D0
Priority number Date
GB9916575 15.07.1999