EP1208550 - AUTOMATIC INSTALLATION PROCESS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEDARDELL LIMITED Wardens End, Low Warden Hexam Northumberland NE46 4DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states CEDARDELL LIMITED Wardens End, Low Warden Hexam, Northumberland NE46 4DN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TODD, Robert, Edmund 38 Broadway Blyth Northumberland NE24 2PP / GB | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord St Nicholas Chambers Amen Corner Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 1PE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00946155.9 | 19.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000GB02777 | Priority number, date | GB19990020015 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9920015 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115112 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208550 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208550 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10, H04L12/28 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G08B25/009 (EP,US);
G08B25/003 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04W92/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/51] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHE INSTALLATION FÜR FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/22] | English: | AUTOMATIC INSTALLATION PROCESS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2002/22] | French: | PROCESSUS D'INSTALLATION AUTOMATIQUE POUR SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | CY | 19.07.2005 | IE | 19.07.2005 | LU | 19.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
LU | 19.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
LU | 19.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59128845 ; | [Y]US4638453 (GRAN PAUL [IL], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,11 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 26 - line 65 * * column 3, line 35 - line 64 *; | [Y]DE3337648 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7,11 * abstract * * page 6, line 41 - page 7, line 48 *; | [Y]WO9114244 (CEDARDELL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,4-7,9,11 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 32; claims 1,2 * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 13 *; | [A]DE19539259 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y]WO9911081 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,4-7,9,11 * abstract * * page 5, line 3 - line 19 * * page 6, line 21 - line 26 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 25 * * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841122), vol. 008, no. 256, Database accession no. (E - 280), & JP59128845 A 19840725 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD.) [A] 2,3 * abstract * |