EP1115278 - MAGNET BUILT-IN FLOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Jong Sung Sam Jung Apt. 105/1308, 290-1 Jung Lim-Dong Seo-Gu Daejon 302-230 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Lee, Jong Sung Sam Jung Apt. 105/1308, 290-1 Jung Lim-Dong Seo-Gu, Daejon 302-230 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Frank-Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00946511.3 | 25.07.2000 | [2001/29] | WO2000KR00798 | Priority number, date | KR19990030470 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: KR 9930470 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110207 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115278 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01K93/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
A01K93/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGELPOSE MIT EINGEBAUTEM MAGNET | [2001/29] | English: | MAGNET BUILT-IN FLOAT | [2001/29] | French: | FLOTTEUR DE PECHE AVEC AIMANT INTEGRE | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2847792 (KUHIMANN EDGAR E) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 42 - line 46 * * column 2, line 1 - line 64 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5351431 (RYU SEOK-JOO [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US3800461 (JACOBI J) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR960003630 ; | [A]KR940000046 ; | [A]KR940009064 ; | [A]JPH04229121 (RYU SOOKUUJU) |