EP1198792 - MAP SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELIA AB 123 86 Farsta / SE | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIANSSON, Jonas Lingonstigen 185 S-973 33 Lule / SE | 02 /
ISAKSSON, Lars- ke Övägen 28 S-954 35 Gammelstad / SE | 03 /
KERO, Roland Sandviksgatan 25, 3 tr S-972 38 Lulea / SE | 04 /
MELANDER, Henrik Trummagatan 15 S-943 33 Öjebyn / SE | 05 /
PARASNIS, Amalendu Krongatan 10 S-972 53 Lule / SE | 06 /
ROSELL, Peter Hökegardsgatan 2 C S-431 38 Mölndal / SE | 07 /
SIKSTRÖM, Andreas Midvinterstigen 7 S-974 51 Lule / SE | [2002/30] |
Former [2002/17] | 01 /
CHRISTIANSSON, Jonas Lingonstigen 185 S-973 33 Lule / SE | ||
02 /
ISAKSSON, Lars- ke Övägen 28 S-954 35 Gammelstad / SE | |||
03 /
KERO, Roland Docentvägen 16 S-977 52 Lule / SE | |||
04 /
MELANDER, Henrik Docentvägen 28 S-977 52 Lule / SE | |||
05 /
PARASNIS, Amalendu Krongatan 10 S-972 53 Lule / SE | |||
06 /
ROSELL, Peter Professorsvägen 29 S-977 51 Lule / SE | |||
07 /
SIKSTRÖM, Andreas Midvinterstigen 7 S-974 51 Lule / SE | Representative(s) | Hopfgarten, Nils, et al Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Hopfgarten, Nils, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00946633.5 | 22.06.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000SE01338 | Priority number, date | SE19990002417 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: SE 9902417 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101370 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198792 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198792 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0969, G01C21/20 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
G01C21/3896 (EP,US);
G08G1/0969 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTENDIENST | [2002/17] | English: | MAP SERVICE | [2002/17] | French: | SERVICE CARTOGRAPHIQUE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 08.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | BE | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | FR | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | NL | 25.05.2005 | CY | 22.06.2005 | IE | 22.06.2005 | LU | 22.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | ES | 05.09.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
IT | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
LU | 22.06.2005 | ||
FR | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
IT | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
LU | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
LU | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 25.07.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 25.07.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5543789 (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]EP0838663 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]); | [AP]EP0933616 (RENAULT [FR]); | [XP]EP0935227 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0943894 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0943895 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]) |