EP1246965 - METHOD FOR ELIMINATING DETRIMENTAL SUBSTANCES IN A PROCESS LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLSSON, Anette Rubinvägen S-852 39 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
HAIAS, Liviu Skönsbergsvägen 25B S-856 45 Sundsvall / SE | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2004/34] | Gellner, Bernd, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung, Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00946710.1 | 05.07.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000SE01427 | Priority number, date | SE19990002636 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: SE 9902636 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104415 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246965 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246965 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/65, D21C9/00, D21C11/00, C02F1/52, C02F1/62, C02F11/12 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
D21C9/004 (EP,US);
C02F1/66 (EP,US);
D21H17/65 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2103/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SCHÄDLICHEN BESTANDTEILEN AUS EINER BEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2002/41] | English: | METHOD FOR ELIMINATING DETRIMENTAL SUBSTANCES IN A PROCESS LIQUID | [2002/41] | French: | ELIMINATION DE SUBSTANCES NUISIBLES D'UN LIQUIDE DE TRAITEMENT | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
19.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
19.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 24.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2007 | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.01.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | ES | 02.01.2005 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 05.07.2005 | IE | 05.07.2005 | LU | 05.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
IT | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
CY | 05.07.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
LU | 05.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
CY | 05.07.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
LU | 05.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
CY | 05.07.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
IE | 05.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3144314 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]US5139613 (LACHAPELLE RAYMOND C [CA]); | [A]EP0737774 (ECC INT LTD [GB]); | [A]US5830364 (BLEAKLEY IAN STUART [GB]); | [A]EP0911443 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) |