EP1166163 - CANTILEVERED MICROSTRUCTURE METHODS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Office of Technology Licensing Suite 510 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley California 94720-1620 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA Office of Technology Licensing, Suite 510, 2150 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, California 94720-1620 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHIN, Behrang 2427 Hilgard Avenue, No. 23 Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | 02 /
LAU, Kam, Y. 5204 Blackhawk Drive Danville, CA 94506 / US | 03 /
MULLER, Richard, S. 51 Kenyon Avenue Kensington, CA 94708-1024 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00946745.7 | 02.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US05744 | Priority number, date | US19990123496P | 09.03.1999 Original published format: US 123496 P | US20000511428 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: US 511428 | [2002/22] |
Former [2002/01] | US19990123496P | 09.03.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0057233 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166163 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, G02B26/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/3566 (EP,US);
G02B26/00 (KR);
G02B26/0816 (EP,US);
G02B6/3572 (EP,US);
G02B6/358 (EP,US);
G02B6/3512 (EP,US);
G02B6/3518 (EP,US);
G02B6/3546 (EP,US);
G02B6/356 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREITRAGENDE MIKROSTRUKTUREN VERWENDENDES VERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGER APPARAT | [2002/01] | English: | CANTILEVERED MICROSTRUCTURE METHODS AND APPARATUS | [2002/01] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL AVEC MICROSTRUCTURE EN PORTE-A-FAUX | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 09.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5774604 (MCDONALD TERRANCE G [US]) [X] 1-42* column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 26 *; | [X] - LIN L Y ET AL, "FREE-SPACE MICROMACHINED OPTICAL SWITCHES WITH SUBMILLISECOND SWITCHING TIME FOR LARGE-SCALE OPTICAL CROSSCONNECTS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19980401), vol. 10, no. 4, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 525 - 527, XP000754214 [X] 1-42 * See section II:"Design and Fabrication" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.662582 | [X] - LAU K Y, "MEM'S THE WORD FOR OPTICAL BEAM MANIPULATION", IEEE CIRCUITS AND DEVICES MAGAZINE,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (199707), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 8755-3996, pages 11 - 18, XP000831634 [X] 1-42 * figures 1,2,14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/101.600704 | [X] - JAECKLIN V P ET AL, "MECHANICAL AND OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF SURFACE MICROMACHINED TORSIONAL MIRRORS IN SILICON, POLYSILICON AND ALUMINUM", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19940501), vol. A43, no. 1/03, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 269 - 275, XP000454122 [X] 1-42 * see section "Fabrication" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(93)00699-5 |