EP1200726 - EROSION RESISTANT ROCKET NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLANTIC RESEARCH CORPORATION 5945 Wellington Road Gainesville Virginia 20155-1699 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states ATLANTIC RESEARCH CORPORATION 5945 Wellington Road Gainesville, Virginia 22065-1699 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNESSEY, Kent, P. 12006 Johns Place Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Simino, Massimo, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila 5 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Simino, Massimo, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00946972.7 | 03.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US18220 | Priority number, date | US19990346686 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: US 346686 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102716 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200726 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/00, F02K9/97, F02K9/84 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F02K9/97 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | F02K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EROSIONSWIDERSTANDSFÄHIGE RAKETENDÜSE | [2002/18] | English: | EROSION RESISTANT ROCKET NOZZLE | [2002/18] | French: | BUSE DE TUYERE RESISTANT A L'EROSION | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 25.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/42] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3243124 (LEE DAVID E) [A] 1-8 * column 2, lines 1-35; figure 1 *; | [A]US3048972 (RONALD BARLOW PEERS) [A] 1-8 * column 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2370864 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, lines 30-40; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1076369 (LORRAINE CARBONE) [A] 1-8 * page 1 * | International search | [X]US3441217 (MCINTOSH HOWARD H); | [Y]US3243124 (LEE DAVID E); | [Y]US5579999 (SEINER JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]US3140584 (RITCHEY HAROLD W, et al); | [A]US4150540 (DOLGONAS GENE [US], et al) |