EP1198475 - HIGHLY PURIFIED CYTOKINE ACTIVATING FACTOR AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences LLC 3521 Silverside Road,Concord Plaza Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences LLC 3521 Silverside Road,Concord Plaza Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Arkion Life Sciences 3521 Silverside Road, Quillen Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IYER, Subramanian 4 Homestead Lane Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Lance 10 Hillcrest Avenue Telford, PA 18969 / US | 03 /
WU, Dauh-Rurng 1011 Sweet Cherry Court Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | 04 /
XING, Ruye 25 Letchworth Ln Avondale, PA19311-1337 / US | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/23] | 01 /
IYER, Subramanian 4 Homestead Lane Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | ||
02 /
NGUYEN, Lance 10 Hillcrest Avenue Telford, PA 18969 / US | |||
03 /
WU, Dauh-Rurng 1502 Setan Villa Lane Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | |||
04 /
XING, Ruye 25 Letchworth Ln Avondale, PA19311-1337 / US | |||
Former [2002/17] | 01 /
IYER, Subramanian 4 Homestead Lane Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | ||
02 /
NGUYEN, Lance 10 Hillcrest Avenue Telford, PA 18969 / US | |||
03 /
WU, Dauh-Rurng 1502 Setan Villa Lane Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | |||
04 /
XING, Ruye 5005 E. Woodmill Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00947517.9 | 19.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US19643 | Priority number, date | US19990145317P | 23.07.1999 Original published format: US 145317 P | US20000197619P | 14.04.2000 Original published format: US 197619 P | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0107472 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198475 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198475 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/46, C07K14/465, C07K14/47, C07K14/475, C07K16/18, C07K16/22, C12N5/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N15/64, C12N15/83, A61K38/17, A61K38/18, A61K9/127, A61K9/48, A61K9/50 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/465 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/853 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGEREINIGTER CYTOKIN-AKTIVIERENDER FAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2002/17] | English: | HIGHLY PURIFIED CYTOKINE ACTIVATING FACTOR AND METHODS OF USE | [2002/17] | French: | FACTEUR D'ACTIVATION DE LA CYTOKINE HAUTEMENT PURIFIE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | CY | 19.07.2005 | IE | 19.07.2005 | LU | 19.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
LU | 19.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.07.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9305160 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]WO9828419 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) |