EP1194724 - REFRIGERATOR OR FREEZER WITH AN AIR FLOW CONTROLLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/15] | AN AIR FLOW CONTROLLING DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATORS AND FREEZERS | ||
[2004/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multibrás S.A. Eletrodomésticos Avenida das Nações Unidas, 12995, 32 , andar CEP-04578-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Multibras S.A. Eletrodomésticos Avenida das Naçoes Unidas, 12995, 32, andar CEP-04578-000 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPES, Luiz Antonio Diemer Apt. 403 Rua Orestes Guimaraes, 740 CEP-89204-060 Joinville, SC / BR | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Held, Stephan, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, Hagemann, Braun und Held, Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00947694.6 | 13.07.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000BR00076 | Priority number, date | BR19999903354 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: BR 9903354 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104555 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194724 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194724 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/04 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F25D21/12 (EP,US);
F25D17/045 (EP,US);
F25D17/065 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0653 (EP,US);
F25D2400/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK ODER GEFRIERSCHRANK MIT LUFTSTROMREGELUNG | [2004/35] | English: | REFRIGERATOR OR FREEZER WITH AN AIR FLOW CONTROLLING DEVICE | [2004/35] | French: | REFRIGERATEUR OU CONGELATEUR AVEC DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE DEBIT D'AIR | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/15] | LUFTSTROMREGELUNG FÜR KÜHLSCHRÄNKE UND GEFRIERSCHRÄNKE | ||
Former [2002/15] | AN AIR FLOW CONTROLLING DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATORS AND FREEZERS | ||
Former [2002/15] | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE DEBIT D'AIR POUR REFRIGERATEURS ET CONGELATEURS | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH1082572 ; | [XPA]US6032469 (KIM SEOK RO [KR], et al) [XP] 1,2 * column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 49; figures 9,10 * [A] 5,6,8; | [X]US5816061 (LEE GEUN HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 11, line 21 - line 64; figures 11-13 *; | [A]US4006601 (BALLARIN JURGEN, et al) [A] 3 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US5711159 (WHIPPLE III WALTER [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0221076 ; | [A]WO9607859 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10082572 A 19980331 (LG ELECTRON INC) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 5,6,8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900328), vol. 014, no. 159, Database accession no. (M - 0956), & JP02021076 A 19900124 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |