Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0100708 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009239939 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | US2331701 | 17.12.2001 | US22990008 | 26.08.2008 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003503569 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0005869 | 23.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5025059B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B2 | JP2003503370 | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1198489 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2004 | B1 | EP1198489 | 24.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00936907 | 21.06.2000 | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6152000 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0005869 | 23.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU776715B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2004 | B2 | AU5222800 | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1208133 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0005869 | 23.06.2000 | EP00947874 | 23.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE265488T | 15.05.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2377207 | 08.01.2013 | C | CA2377207 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2377211 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0005869 | 23.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19956502 | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50006269D1 | 03.06.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | DE50006269 | 21.06.2000 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2219346T | 01.12.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01012802 | 24.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0005869 | 23.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003026840 | 06.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956502 | 24.11.1999 | EP0005778 | 21.06.2000 | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0100709 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1063254 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99112260 | 25.06.1999 |