EP1205000 - COOLING SYSTEM FOR FUEL CELLS AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/20] | COOLING SYSTEM FOR FUEL CELLS | ||
[2003/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Leo-Brandt-Strasse 52428 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOM, Frank Kopernikusstrasse 25 D-52353 Düren / DE | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00947946.0 | 07.07.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000EP06450 | Priority number, date | DE19991035719 | 29.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19935719 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109969 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205000 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205000 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/24, H01M8/02 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/2484 (US);
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/16] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DESSELBEN | [2003/46] | English: | COOLING SYSTEM FOR FUEL CELLS AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2003/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE CELLULES A COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDE DE SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/20] | KÜHLSYSTEM FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | ||
Former [2002/20] | COOLING SYSTEM FOR FUEL CELLS | ||
Former [2002/20] | SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE CELLULES A COMBUSTIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 08.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | IT | 14.04.2004 | NL | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IT | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH097624 ; | [A]JPS62237678 ; | [X]WO9413026 (HSU MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 16 * * page 7, line 11 - line 36 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5338622 (HSU MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 6 * * column 3, line 13 - line 18 * * column 3, line 37 - line 41 * * column 3, line 49 - line 58 * * column 4, line 7 - line 18 *; | [DPA]DE19853911 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [DPA] 1,4,6 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 42 - line 65 * * column 3, line 39 - line 53 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09007624 A 19970110 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880407), vol. 012, no. 108, Database accession no. (E - 597), & JP62237678 A 19871017 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 4 * abstract * |