07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
19.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
21.12.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
17.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
12.01.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
30.12.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.12.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.09.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.09.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
01.09.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
18.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
24.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
05.04.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
05.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
26.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|