EP1119198 - DIGITAL IMAGE RECORDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTEX CO. LTD. 4-7-5 Nionohama Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0801 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states OPTEX CO. LTD. 4-7-5 Nionohama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0801 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI, Akihiko 553-2, Seiwain-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-8003 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMOTO, Kazutaka 1-39-14, Douyama 1-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00948261.3 | 27.07.2000 | [2001/30] | WO2000JP05037 | Priority number, date | JP19990214311 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21431199 | [2001/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0108416 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119198 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALES BILDAUFZEICHNUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/30] | English: | DIGITAL IMAGE RECORDING SYSTEM | [2001/30] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENREGISTREMENT NUMERIQUE D'IMAGES | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2001 | Translation filed | 27.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9819450 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 89, line 14 - page 92, line 23 * * page 119, line 25 - page 120, line 19 * * page 163, line 2 - page 166, line 9 *; | [X]WO9211614 (KATZ BARRY [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 6, line 25 - page 12, line 27 * | International search | [Y]JPH11164289 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08265737 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JPS61179694 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH09259381 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPH09182062 (SIGMAX KK) |