EP1218718 - DIRECT ASPIRATION-REACTION AND INJECTION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asp Diagnostics Pty Ltd 728 Ford Road Burbank, Queensland 4156 / AU | [2004/21] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states King, Brian William 77 Gloucester Road Buderim, QLD 4556 / AU | ||
For all designated states Harrison, Bruce trading as SXY TECH 6 Devon Street Eastern Heights, QLD 4305 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Bruce William 77 Gloucester Road Buderim, Queensland 4556 / AU | 02 /
Harrison, Bruce 6 Devon Street Eastern Heights, Queensland 4305 / AU | [2004/21] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00949003.8 | 04.08.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000AU00931 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ02039 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: AU PQ203999 | AU2000PQ07039 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: AU PQ703900 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111336 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218718 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14, C12Q1/68, B01L3/02, A61M1/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B01L3/022 (EP);
B01L3/5082 (EP);
B01L2300/0838 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
B01L3/5027 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | G01N1/14, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIREKTEN INJEKTION UND ASPIRATION-REAKTION UND ZUGEHÖRIGES ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/27] | English: | DIRECT ASPIRATION-REACTION AND INJECTION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE | [2002/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION ET D'ASPIRATION-REACTION DIRECTES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 06.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2004 | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3910103 (ROSE EWALD) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 68 * [Y] 10; | [XY]DE2211098 (KREFT GUENTHER) [X] 1-5 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1,2 * [Y] 10; | [Y]US4588556 (SARSTEDT WALTER [DE]) [Y] 10 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 31 *; | [A]US4510058 (CAIS MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]CA1113275 ; | [AP]US5968729 ; | [A]US4804050 |