blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1222740

EP1222740 - PHASE-LOCKING LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2002/29]
Inventor(s)01 / GÖTZ, Edmund
Müller-Dachau-Weg 8
D-85221 Dachau / DE
02 / MEMMLER, Bernd
Karl-Stielerstrasse 8
D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE
03 / SCHÖNLEBER, Günter
Thalkirchner Strasse 184
D-81371 München / DE
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date00949116.816.06.2000
[2002/29]
WO2000DE01987
Priority number, dateDE199914620027.09.1999         Original published format: DE 19946200
[2002/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0124374
Date:05.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1222740
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1222740
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:H03L7/197, H03L7/10
[2002/29]
CPC:
H03L7/1976 (EP,US); H03L7/08 (KR); H03L7/1072 (EP,US);
H03L7/1972 (EP,US); H03L7/0898 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/48]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:PHASENREGELKREIS[2002/29]
English:PHASE-LOCKING LOOP[2002/29]
French:BOUCLE A PHASE ASSERVIE[2002/29]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2002National basic fee paid 
31.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
13.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2003Fee for grant paid
24.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH05206848  ;
 [X]US5276408  (NORIMATSU HIDEHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,9-13 * column 6, line 14 - column 8, line 19 *;
 [X]EP0641082  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 24 *;
 [A]US5420545  (DAVIS CRAIG M [US], et al) [A] 9* column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 59 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931129), vol. 017, no. 642, Database accession no. (E - 1466), & JP05206848 A 19930813 (FUJITSU LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.