EP1196257 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING A METAL STRIP USING A SIZING STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELKL, Hans-Joachim Dreifaltigkeitsweg 8 D-91301 Forchheim / DE | 02 /
GÖPEL, Joachim Fichtenstrasse 18 D-91094 Langensendelbach / DE | 03 /
WINKLER, Robert Donato-Polli-Strasse 54 D-91056 Erlangen / DE | [2002/16] | Application number, filing date | 00949144.0 | 04.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000DE02172 | Priority number, date | DE1999133239 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933239 | [2002/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105529 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196257 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196257 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/56 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B21B37/56 (EP);
B21B2001/228 (EP);
B21B37/54 (EP);
B21B39/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FI, GB, IT [2003/38] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM WALZEN EINES METALLBANDES MITTELS EINES DRESSIERGERÜSTES | [2002/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING A METAL STRIP USING A SIZING STAND | [2002/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE LAMINAGE D'UNE BANDE METALLIQUE AU MOYEN D'UNE CAGE DE DRESSAGE | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63256209 ; | [A]JPH04305305 ; | [A]JPS5581011 ; | [A]JPH01180713 ; | [A]JPS59127917 ; | [A]JPH06285505 ; | [XA]GB1301532 (ALLMANNA SVENSKA ELEKTRISKA AKTIEBOLAGET) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5,8,9; | [XA]FR2201142 (CARNAUD & FORGES [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890203), vol. 013, no. 048, Database accession no. (M - 793), & JP63256209 A 19881024 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930312), vol. 017, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 1379), & JP04305305 A 19921028 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800830), vol. 004, no. 123, Database accession no. (M - 029), & JP55081011 A 19800618 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891019), vol. 013, no. 462, Database accession no. (M - 881), & JP01180713 A 19890718 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1,4-7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841120), vol. 008, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 339), & JP59127917 A 19840723 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06285505 A 19941011 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |