EP1198642 - COATING COLOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited Cleckheaton Road, Low Moor, P.O. Box 38 Bradford West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited Cleckheaton Road, Low Moor, P.O. Box 38 Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTON, Philip, Mark 21 Ennerdale Drive Elland, West Yorkshire HY5 9QJ / GB | 02 /
COCKCROFT, Robert 1 Westminster Crescent, Clayton Bradford, West Yorkshire BD14 6SH / GB | [2002/17] | Application number, filing date | 00949360.2 | 17.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000EP06790 | Priority number, date | GB19990017508 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9917508 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0107714 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198642 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198642 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/58, C09D157/00, C09D5/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
D21H19/58 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/06 (KR);
C09D123/04 (KR);
C09D5/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2002/17] | English: | COATING COLOUR | [2002/17] | French: | SAUCE DE COUCHAGE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.03.2005 | CY | 17.07.2005 | LU | 17.07.2005 | IE | 18.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | GR | 29.03.2005 | |
CY | 17.07.2005 | ||
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | GR | 29.03.2005 | |
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | GR | 29.03.2005 | |
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | GR | 29.03.2005 | |
IE | 18.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 29.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3937633 (KNIGHT BRUCE L, et al) [A] 10* column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 44; table 1 *; | [A]US4115339 (RESTAINO ALFRED J) [A] 10 * example 3 *; | [AD]US4423118 (CORBETT PETER J [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * column W *; | [A]US4652471 (VAN ROODEN BERNARDUS J M S [CH], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 8, line 32 - line 58 * |