EP1218875 - METHOD FOR DECREASING THE PROCESSING CAPACITY REQUIRED BY SPEECH ENCODING AND A NETWORK ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKANIEMI, Ari Suvantokatu 1 D 30 FIN-33100 Tampere / FI | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00949507.8 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000FI00647 | Priority number, date | FI19990001605 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: FI 991605 | [2002/27] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0108136 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218875 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218875 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G10L11/02, G10L19/00, G10L19/14 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G10L19/173 (EP,US);
G10L19/012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/27] | G10L11/02, G10L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER, FÜR DIE SPRACHKODIERUNG ERFORDERLICHEN VERARBEITUNGSKAPAZITÄT UND NETZWERKELEMENT | [2002/27] | English: | METHOD FOR DECREASING THE PROCESSING CAPACITY REQUIRED BY SPEECH ENCODING AND A NETWORK ELEMENT | [2002/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE LA CAPACITE DE TRAITEMENT REQUISE PAR LE CODAGE DE LA PAROLE ET ELEMENT RESEAU | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2002 | Translation filed | 05.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 09.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | BE | 11.06.2003 | CH | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | IT | 11.06.2003 | LI | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | CY | 14.07.2003 | IE | 14.07.2003 | LU | 14.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
IE | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
IE | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
LU | 14.07.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 14.07.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5483619 (BLANCHARD SIMON [GB]); | [A]US5555546 (MATSUMOTO ICHIRO [JP]); | [A]EP0843301 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]US5867574 (ERYILMAZ EROL [US]); | [AP]WO9940569 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |