EP1196346 - METHOD FOR FILLING A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.E.R.A.C. GROUP Route de Mamers 72400 La Ferte-Bernard / FR | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAFFIN, André Serac Group, Route de Mamers 72400 La Ferte Bernard / FR | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00949609.2 | 03.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000FR01882 | Priority number, date | FR19990009327 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909327 | [2002/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105698 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196346 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196346 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/20, G01G13/285 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G01G13/2851 (EP,US);
B67C3/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES BEHÄLTERS | [2002/16] | English: | METHOD FOR FILLING A CONTAINER | [2002/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RECIPIENT | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 27.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0406092 (GRAFFIN ANDRE [FR]); | [Y]EP0524850 (GRAFFIN ANDRE [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 1; figures 1,2 *; | [D]FR2679516 (GRAFFIN ANDRE [FR]); | [A]DE9306625U (FEIGE GMBH); | [Y]WO9511830 (GRAFFIN ANDRE J J [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, line 9 - line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [D]FR2711610 (GRAFFIN ANDRE J J [FR]) |