EP1112630 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING SIGNAL-TO- NOISE RATIO IN A TELECOMMUNICATION RECEIVER AND APPLICATION OF SAID METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPAILLE, Cédric 5, place Maurice Berteaux F-78400 Chatou / FR | 02 /
CALOT, Guillaume 15 avenue de Villars 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2001/27] | Smith, Bradford Lee, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00949652.2 | 06.07.2000 | [2001/27] | WO2000FR01943 | Priority number, date | FR19990008842 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9908842 | [2001/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105073 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112630 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112630 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04B7/005 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES SIGNAL-RAUSCH-VERHÄLTNISSES IN EINEM TELECOMMUNIKATIONSEMFÄNGER SOWIE ANWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SENDERS | [2001/27] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING SIGNAL-TO- NOISE RATIO IN A TELECOMMUNICATION RECEIVER AND APPLICATION OF SAID METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A TRANSMITTER | [2001/27] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DU RAPPORT SIGNAL A BRUIT DANS UN RECEPTEUR DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS ET APPLICATION DE CE PROCEDE AU CONTROLE D'UN EMETTEUR | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | IE | 06.07.2012 | LU | 06.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
SE | 25.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0589595 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 33 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]US5559790 (YANO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,15* abstract * | Examination | US5809065 | US5918184 |