EP1210167 - AIR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYNE, John David Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42 Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | 02 /
HYDE(nee DUKES), Helen Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42 Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2002/23] | Application number, filing date | 00949709.0 | 26.07.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000GB02878 | Priority number, date | GB19990019127 | 13.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9919127 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112296 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210167 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210167 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B01D39/16 (EP,US);
B01D39/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTFILTER | [2002/23] | English: | AIR FILTER | [2002/23] | French: | FILTRE A AIR | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 31.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | BE | 05.11.2003 | CY | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | IE | 26.07.2004 | LU | 26.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
IE | 26.07.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
IE | 26.07.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
LU | 26.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6242715 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 13, Database accession no. 1987-091375, XP002150935 & JPS6242715 A 19870224 (TOYOBO KK) [A] * abstract * |