EP1229088 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE INK OR PAINT, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND WRITING IMPLEMENTS HAVING THE INK PACKED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maruai Corporation 2603, Ichikawadaimon-cho Nishiyatsushiro-gun Yamanashi 409-3601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Maruai Corporation 2603, Ichikawadaimon-cho Nishiyatsushiro-gun, Yamanashi 409-3601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURAMOTO, Noriyuki 2-48-5, Rinsenji 2-chome Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata 992-0062 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Noriko Maruai Corporation, 2603, Ichikawadaimon-cho Nishiyatsushiro-gun, Yamanashi 409-3601 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00949996.3 | 04.08.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000JP05240 | Priority number, date | JP19990224144 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22414499 | [2002/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110962 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229088 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D5/24, C09D179/02, B43K8/00, H01B1/12 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C09D11/52 (EP);
C09D179/02 (EP);
C09D5/24 (EP);
H01B1/128 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | C09D11/00, C09D5/24, C09D179/02, B43K8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE TINTE ODER FARBE, VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN SOWIE DIESE TINTE BEINHALTENDE SCHREIBGERÄTE | [2002/32] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE INK OR PAINT, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND WRITING IMPLEMENTS HAVING THE INK PACKED THEREIN | [2002/32] | French: | ENCRE OU PEINTURE ELECTROCONDUCTRICE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIE, ET MATERIEL D'ECRITURE INCORPORANT CETTE ENCRE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2002 | Translation filed | 27.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0758671 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 2,8 * page 12, line 39 - line 44; claims 1-8 * | International search | [A]WO9222911 ; | [A]JPH09316366 ; | [A]JPH06279584 |