EP1120172 - ROLLING MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Mikio, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. Hiroshima Machin. Works, 6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi 4chome, Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
HIGASHIO, Atsushi, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. Hiroshima R&D Center, 6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi4chome Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
FURUMOTO, Hideaki, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. Hiroshima R&D Center, 6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi4chome Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 04 /
MORIHIRA, Naoki, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. Hiroshima R&D Center, 6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi4chome Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI, Kanji, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. Hiroshima R&D Center, 6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi4chome Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 06 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsuhiro, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD Hiroshima R&D Center, 6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi4chome Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 07 /
MORIMOTO, Kazuo, c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND., LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/23] |
Former [2001/31] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Mikio, c/o Hiroshima Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy In Ltd, 4-6-22, Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshi / JP | ||
02 /
HIGASHIO, Atsushi, c/o Hiroshima Res & Dev Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd, 4-6-22, Kan-on-shi-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshi / JP | |||
03 /
FURUMOTO, Hideaki, c/o Hiroshima Res & Dev Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd, 4-6-22, Kan-on-shi-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshi / JP | |||
04 /
MORIHIRA, Naoki, c/o Hiroshima Res & Dev Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd, 4-6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshi / JP | |||
05 /
HAYASHI, Kanji, c/o Hiroshima Res & Dev Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd, 4-6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima / JP | |||
06 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsuhiro, c/o Hiroshima Res & Dev Center Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd, 4-6-22,Kan-on-shin-machi Nishi-ku, Hiroshima / JP | |||
07 /
MORIMOTO, Kazuo, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind Ltd 2-5-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00950040.6 | 08.08.2000 | [2001/31] | WO2000JP05302 | Priority number, date | JP19990227349 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22734999 | JP20000187163 | 22.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000187163 | [2001/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112353 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120172 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120172 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/02 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
B21B13/023 (EP,US);
B21B31/32 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2013/025 (EP,US);
B21B2031/206 (EP,US);
B21B2269/14 (EP,US);
B21B31/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | B21B13/14, B21B31/02, B21B31/22, B21B31/24, B21B31/30, B21B31/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WALZWERK | [2005/13] | English: | ROLLING MILL | [2001/31] | French: | LAMINOIR | [2001/31] |
Former [2001/31] | Walzwerk | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | Translation filed | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 16.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 02.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1190513 ; | [A]JPS56151111 ; | [A]GB1596192 (CH POLT I) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 13-17; figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11090513 A 19990406 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820305), vol. 006, no. 036, Database accession no. (M - 115), & JP56151111 A 19811124 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [AP]EP1005921 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH09285805 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH05293518 (HITACHI LTD) |