EP1209650 - DATA DISPLAY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optiva, Inc. 377 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-1962 / US | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZAREV, Pavel Ivanovich ul. Novoorlovskaya, 12-120 Moscow, 119633 / RU | 02 /
BOBROV, Jury Alexandrovich K-575-906-128 Moscow, 103575 / RU | 03 /
NAZAROV, Viktor Vasilievich ul. Komsomolskaya, 6-92 Odintsovo, Moskovskaya obl., 143000 / RU | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00950151.1 | 17.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000RU00300 | Priority number, date | RU19990117000 | 04.08.1999 Original published format: RU 99117000 | [2002/22] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111597 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209650 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/18, G09G3/36 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G02F1/13306 (EP);
G02F1/13324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENANZEIGEMODUL | [2002/22] | English: | DATA DISPLAY MODULE | [2002/22] | French: | MODULE DE VISUALISATION DE DONNEES | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2002 | Translation filed | 01.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 01.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 03.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01296289 (INOBEESHIYON CENTER KK); | [A]JPH07175058 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]FR2694109 (REALISA MATERIELS ELECTRO ET [FR]); | [A]US5339091 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al); | [A]RU2075112 (TROITSKIJ GEORGIJ N [RU], et al) |