EP1202994 - NEW COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2002/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGE, Odd-Geir AstraZeneca R & D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | 02 /
CLAESSON, Alf AstraZeneca R & D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
SWAHN, Britt-Marie AstraZeneca R & D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2002/19] | Application number, filing date | 00950173.5 | 20.07.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000SE01506 | Priority number, date | SE19990002762 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: SE 9902762 | SE20000000263 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: SE 0000263 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105790 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202994 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1202994 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/20, C07D487/10, C07D495/10, C07D497/10, A61K31/438, A61K31/4747, A61K31/4985 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/20 (KR);
C07D487/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US);
C07D491/107 (KR);
C07D491/20 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | 21.02.2002 | LT | 21.02.2002 | LV | 21.02.2002 | MK | 21.02.2002 | RO | 21.02.2002 | SI | 21.02.2002 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/19] | English: | NEW COMPOUNDS | [2002/19] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04002774.0 / EP1426375 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Request for further processing for: | 19.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3936459 (KATO HIDEO, et al); | [A]US5376661 (GUILLAUMET GERALD [FR], et al); | [A]US5420150 (GUILLAUMET GERALD [FR], et al); | [A]US5633247 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [A] - MILTON J. KORNET ET AL., "Oxindole-3-spiropyrrolidines and -piperidines. Synthesis and local anesthetic activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1976), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 892 - 898, XP002934503 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00229a007 | [A] - J. GRUNDY, "An eliminiation reaction of O-alkoxycarbonylbenzyl bromides", CHEMISTRY AND INDUSTRY, (19561020), pages 1145 - 1146, XP002934504 | [A] - AKINO JOSSANG ET AL., "Horsfiline, an oxindole alkaloid from horsfieldia superba", J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, pages 6527 - 6530, XP002934505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00023a016 | [A] - MARTIN E. KUEHNE ET AL., "Studies in biomimetic alkaloid syntheses. 2. Synthesis of vincadifformine from tetrahydro-beta-carboline through a secodine intermediate", J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, no. 19, pages 3705 - 3710, XP002934506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00413a015 | [A] - CLAUDIO PELLEGRINI ET AL., "Synthesis of the oxindole alkaloid (-)-horsfiline", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1994), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 1979 - 1992, XP002934507 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)86273-4 |