Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006014559 | ![]() | 07.12.2006 | A3 | WO2006014559 | 09.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006014552 | ![]() | 14.12.2006 | A3 | WO2006014552 | 09.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005117935 | ![]() | 15.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005014617 | ![]() | 07.07.2005 | A3 | WO2005014617 | 17.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03006620 | ![]() | 27.11.2003 | A3 | WO03006620 | 23.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7897721 | ![]() | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2010121027 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | US26927105 | 09.11.2005 | US34848909 | 05.01.2009 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7473760 | ![]() | 06.01.2009 | B2 | US2006111281 | 25.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | US26927105 | 09.11.2005 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7342089 | ![]() | 11.03.2008 | B2 | US2006014676 | 19.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7345144 | ![]() | 18.03.2008 | B2 | US2006014194 | 19.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7235625 | ![]() | 26.06.2007 | B2 | US2005222014 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7417027 | ![]() | 26.08.2008 | B2 | US2005038230 | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US75621204 | 12.01.2004 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005037951 | ![]() | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94696904 | 20.09.2004 | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7176279 | ![]() | 13.02.2007 | B2 | US2004138136 | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070036079 | ![]() | 02.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008505917 | ![]() | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | WO2005US24138 | 06.07.2005 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008505915 | ![]() | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | WO2005US24125 | 06.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008500369 | ![]() | 10.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004534851 | ![]() | 18.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4576493B | ![]() | 10.11.2010 | B2 | JP2003503357 | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1789069 | ![]() | 26.01.2011 | A4 | EP1789069 | 30.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | WO2005US24125 | 06.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1781316 | ![]() | 26.01.2011 | A4 | EP1781316 | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | WO2005US24138 | 06.07.2005 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1755638 | ![]() | 29.07.2009 | A4 | EP1755638 | 28.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1667700 | ![]() | 11.11.2009 | A4 | EP1667700 | 14.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63807103 | 08.08.2003 | WO2004US25749 | 09.08.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1593384 | ![]() | 26.04.2006 | A3 | EP1593384 | 09.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | EP00950283 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1441750 | ![]() | 18.10.2006 | A4 | EP1441750 | 04.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU783718B | ![]() | 01.12.2005 | B2 | AU6340700 | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005269920 | ![]() | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | WO2005US24125 | 06.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005269831 | ![]() | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | WO2005US24138 | 06.07.2005 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005249474 | ![]() | 15.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002322466B | ![]() | 30.08.2007 | B2 | AU2002322466 | 29.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1196184 | ![]() | 15.06.2005 | B8 | EP1196184 | 20.04.2005 | B1 | EP1196184 | 28.05.2003 | A4 | EP1196184 | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE293453T | 15.05.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0012200 | 06.08.2013 | B1 | BR0012200 | 26.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0510862 | 26.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2376978 | 20.11.2012 | C | CA2376978 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2453515 | 23.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0222196 | 11.07.2002 | US30483601 | 11.07.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2568218 | 15.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2573142 | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | WO2005US24125 | 06.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2574605 | 09.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | WO2005US24138 | 06.07.2005 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101010095 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101010096 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1988915 | 27.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60019598T | 29.09.2005 | T2 | DE60019598D1 | 25.05.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1196184T | 06.06.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1047881 | 14.10.2005 | B | HK1047881 | 14.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007000311 | 02.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | WO2005US24138 | 06.07.2005 | US17485105 | 05.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007000312 | 03.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | US17484505 | 05.07.2005 | WO2005US24125 | 06.07.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02000111 | 21.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06013814 | 01.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US57508204 | 27.05.2004 | WO2005US18739 | 27.05.2005 | US13973005 | 26.05.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ516030 | 29.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US0018217 | 29.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6794489 | 21.09.2004 | B2 | US2002107182 | 08.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US4054702 | 04.01.2002 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200701039 | 27.08.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US58597104 | 06.07.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0100224 | ![]() | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101021632B | ![]() | 17.03.2011 | B1 | KR20020016876 | 06.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2235921T | 16.07.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1196184E | 31.08.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6579968 | 17.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US19498700 | 05.04.2000 | US60650100 | 28.06.2000 | US14234699 | 29.06.1999 | Type | ![]() | EP1593384 |