|
22.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.03.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.10.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |