EP1115991 - FLAP VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/48] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIMMER, Erwin Scheffelweg 9 D-73655 Pluederhausen / DE | 02 /
KRAUSE, Ralph Luikenweg 6 D-71334 Waiblingen / DE | [2003/19] |
Former [2001/29] | 01 /
KRIMMER, Erwin Scheffelweg 9 D-73655 Pluederhausen / DE | ||
02 /
KRAUSE, Ralph Stoerzbachstrasse 13 D-70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00951219.5 | 10.06.2000 | [2001/29] | WO2000DE01917 | Priority number, date | DE1999134113 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19934113 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0107808 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115991 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1115991 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/02, F02D9/10, F02M25/07 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
F16K1/225 (EP,US);
F02D9/04 (EP,US);
F02D9/10 (EP,US);
F02M26/21 (EP,US);
F02M26/54 (EP,US);
F02M26/70 (EP,US);
F16K1/221 (EP,US);
F16K27/0218 (EP,US);
F16K31/045 (EP,US);
F02M26/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPENVENTIL | [2001/29] | English: | FLAP VALVE | [2001/29] | French: | SOUPAPE A CLAPET | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5531205 (COOK JOHN E [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,8,14,16 * column 3, line 10 - line 66; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0200868 (MUELLER FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 23 - line 39; figure 4 *; | [A]DE19729335 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,14-16 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 2; figure - * | by applicant | DE4305123 |