|
19.11.2004 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Decision to allow the request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Grounds for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Grounds for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Loss of priority right |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Invitation to pay administrative fee for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.12.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.01.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
34 |