Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
19.11.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
02.08.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
20.02.2004 | First examination report | |
18.02.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2003 | Change - representative | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
13.08.2002 | Change - extension states | |
13.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
12.07.2002 | Renewal fee | |
28.03.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
28.03.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
26.03.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.02.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.10.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |