EP1188026 - TUBE FOR USE IN FLUID EVAPORATION TECHNIQUES, IN PARTICULAR FOOD FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE MEUSIENNE DE CONSTRUCTIONS MECANIQUES 55170 ANCERVILLE / FR | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOULANGE, Laurence 240, chemin de Chamousset F-73460 Sainte Hélène sur Isère / FR | 02 /
HAEGELI, Françoise 4, rue Django Reinhardt F-78260 Achères / FR | 03 /
CHOBERT, Jo[l 16, rue de la Liberté F-52410 Roches sur Marne / FR | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/12] | Neyret, Daniel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00951620.4 | 21.06.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000FR01702 | Priority number, date | FR19990007908 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907908 | [2002/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079187 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188026 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/02, B01D1/06 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C13B25/001 (EP);
B01D1/06 (EP);
C13B25/04 (EP);
F28F13/18 (EP);
F28F19/00 (EP);
F28F2245/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHR, GEEIGNET FÜR DEN EINSATZ IN DER VERDAMPFUNGSTECHNIK VON FLUIDEN, BESONDERS VON LEBENSMITTELFLUIDEN | [2002/12] | English: | TUBE FOR USE IN FLUID EVAPORATION TECHNIQUES, IN PARTICULAR FOOD FLUID | [2002/12] | French: | TUBE POUVANT ETRE UTILISE DANS DES TECHNIQUES D'EVAPORATION DE FLUIDE, NOTAMMENT DE FLUIDE ALIMENTAIRE | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11132683 ; | [Y]JPH10185356 ; | [Y]JPH0979693 ; | [A]FR2697077 (SOFATH S.A.) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]JPH0244165 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 199, no. 910, & JP11132683 A 19990521 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 199, no. 812, & JP10185356 A 19980714 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 199, no. 707, & JP09079693 A 19970328 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900426), vol. 014, no. 206, & JP02044165 A 19900214 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |