14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
02.09.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
13.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
06.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
01.10.2004 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
10.09.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
06.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.04.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.09.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
21.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
15.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
15.11.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
23.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
29.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.04.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
12.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
10.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|