EP1208620 - UNIVERSAL QUICK CONNECTOR APPARATUS FOR AN LCD MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moscovitch, Jerry 86 Truman Avenue Toronto Ontario M2L 2L6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Moscovitch, Jerry 86 Truman Avenue Toronto, Ontario M2L 2L6 / CA | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Mass Engineered Design Suite 300, 510 Front St. West Toronto, Ontario 45V 1B8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
MOSCOVITCH, Jerry 59 Cowar Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6K 2N1 / CA | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00951779.8 | 22.08.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000IB01148 | Priority number, date | US19990150307P | 23.08.1999 Original published format: US 150307 P | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115285 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208620 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208620 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/14 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H01R13/627 (EP,US);
H01R24/66 (KR);
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
F16M11/041 (EP,US);
F16M11/043 (EP,US);
F16M11/14 (EP,US);
F16M13/00 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/621 (EP,US);
H01R13/6335 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0073 (EP,US);
B60R2011/008 (EP,US);
F16M2200/024 (EP,US);
F16M2200/06 (EP,US);
F16M2200/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/44] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE SCHNELLBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN LCD MONITOR | [2002/22] | English: | UNIVERSAL QUICK CONNECTOR APPARATUS FOR AN LCD MONITOR | [2002/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONNEXION RAPIDE UNIVERSELLE POUR UN MONITEUR ACL | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04022922.1 / EP1489704 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | BE | 27.10.2004 | CH | 27.10.2004 | ES | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | FR | 27.10.2004 | IT | 27.10.2004 | LI | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
ES | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
IT | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
ES | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
FR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3348116 (FREEMAN ARTHUR H, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 43 - line 63; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5009384 (GERKE DAVID B [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5687939 (MOSCOVITCH JERRY [CA]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 12 - line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [PX]WO0039493 (MOSCOVITCH JERRY [CA], et al) [PX] 1 * page 18, line 21 - line 30; figure 20 * |