EP1207689 - HEAD-MOUNTED VIDEO DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/14] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGASAWARA, Yuji 1351-1-701, Uchikoshi-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0911 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Etsuyasu 47-3-108, Misawa 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0032 / JP | 03 /
KIYOKAWA, Izuru 3248-3-101, Oyama-cho Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0212 / JP | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00951980.2 | 14.08.2000 | [2002/21] | WO2000JP05436 | Priority number, date | JP19990238613 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23861399 | JP19990283065 | 04.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28306599 | [2002/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115439 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207689 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64, G09F9/00, G02B27/02 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP);
H04N13/344 (EP);
H04N13/398 (EP);
H04N5/64 (EP);
H04N5/7491 (EP);
H04N9/3141 (EP);
G02B2027/0132 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP);
H04N13/194 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AM KOPF GETRAQGENES GERÄT ZUR ANZEIGE VON VIDEO | [2002/21] | English: | HEAD-MOUNTED VIDEO DISPLAY | [2002/21] | French: | AFFICHEUR VIDEO SE PORTANT SUR LA TETE | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | Translation filed | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/24] | Divisional application(s) | EP05016883.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 06.09.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0909972 (KOPIN CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 5B,19,27C,28A-28L,37A; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0012] , [0037] , [0048] , [0062] , [0063] , [0088] - [0094] - [0107] , [0127] - [0143] - [0170] * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]JPH07218861 ; | [Y]JPH09322199 ; | [Y]US5825539 (HOSHI HIROAKI [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 42 *; | [Y]EP0716329 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1049065 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07218861 A 19950818 (CANON INC) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09322199 A 19971212 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10049065 A 19980220 (SHICHIZUN DENSHI:KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH08251510 ; | [Y]JPH1049065 ; | [Y]JPH1138351 ; | [Y]JPH07218861 ; | [Y]JPS6271984U |