EP1213003 - RECESSED PART FORMING INSTILLATION CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASHIMA, Yoichi@Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | 02 /
KUSU, Yukio@Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Hiroshi@Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
KAWASHIMA, Yoichi Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
KUSU, Yukio Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMADA, Hiroshi Santen Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 533-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 00951999.2 | 14.08.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000JP05458 | Priority number, date | JP19990230652 | 17.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23065299 | [2002/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112125 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213003 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213003 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/32, B65D47/18 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G01F11/082 (EP,US);
A61F9/0008 (EP,US);
B65D1/08 (EP,US);
B65D23/102 (EP,US);
B65D47/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/24] | A61J1/05, B65D83/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Title | German: | EINE EINEN INSTILLATIONSBEHÄLTER BILDENDE AUSSPARUNG | [2002/24] | English: | RECESSED PART FORMING INSTILLATION CONTAINER | [2002/24] | French: | ELEMENT ENCASTRE FORMANT UN CONTENEUR D'INSTILLATION | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2002 | Translation filed | 18.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2673661 (BARTON MURRAY M) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0312725 (HANSEN BERND) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 20; claim 10 *; | [Y]US4909801 (CASEY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, lines 23-40; figure -- *; | [Y]DE4229734 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 2, lines 52-68 *; | [Y]US5624057 (LIFSHEY ARTHUR L [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 10-61 *; | [A]WO9825829 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1-3* figure --; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2003003975Y ; | [A]JPS3922583Y ; | [Y]JPS58153843U ; | [Y]EP0312725 (HANSEN BERND); | [A]JPH0544134U ; | [Y]JPH065631U |