EP1206810 - SEAL FOR METAL-AIR BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULL, Matthew, P. 761 North Main Road Jamestown, RI 02835 / US | 02 /
SEARLE, Gary, M. 24 Barnstable Road Norfolk, MA 02056 / US | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00952601.3 | 07.08.2000 | [2002/21] | WO2000US21539 | Priority number, date | US19990374278 | 13.08.1999 Original published format: US 374278 | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113456 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1206810 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06, H01M2/08 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
H01M12/06 (EP,US);
H01M50/186 (EP,US);
H01M50/191 (EP,US);
H01M50/193 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNG FÜR EINE METALL-LUFT-BATTERIE | [2002/21] | English: | SEAL FOR METAL-AIR BATTERY | [2002/21] | French: | JOINT D'ETANCHEITE DESTINE A UNE PILE METAL-AIR | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5626988 (DANIEL-IVAD JOSEF [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-14 * column 6, line 13 - line 27 * * column 1, line 18 - line 21 * [A] 17,18,23,26,27; | [PX]EP0940866 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-18,24-27 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 ** page 28, line 31 - page 29, line 25; figure 30 * |