EP1214079 - DRUG FOR TREATING FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 05.09.2008 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.09.2008 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Alexandra Hospital for Children Cnr Hawksbury Road & Hainsworth Street Westmead, NSW 2145 / AU | [2002/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITTLE, David G Suite 3, Children's Hospital Medical Centre Hainsworth Street, Westmead, NSW 2145 / AU | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Leon, Susanna Iris Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Leon, Susanna Iris Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2002/25] | Stark, Amanda Jane, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00952791.2 | 17.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000AU00982 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ02325 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: AU PQ232599 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113922 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214079 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/663, A61K31/675, A61K19/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP);
A61K31/6615 (KR);
A61K31/675 (EP);
A61K49/0008 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | A61K31/663, A61P19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 13.03.2002 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FRAKTUREN | [2002/25] | English: | DRUG FOR TREATING FRACTURES | [2002/25] | French: | MEDICAMENT POUR TRAITER DES FRACTURES | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/41] | 11.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002 | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4530360 (DUARTE LUIZ R [BR]) [Y] 21-27* abstract *; | [XY]EP0600834 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-20,28-36 * the whole document * [Y] 21-27; | [XY]WO9414455 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20,28-36 * page 3, line 21 - line 30 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * page 9, line 6 - line 15 * * claims * [Y] 21-27; | [X]WO9530421 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-9,11-20,28-36 * the whole document *; | [X] - DENISSEN H ET AL, "CERAMIC HYDROXYAPATITE IMPLANTS FOR THE RELEASE OF BIPHOSPHONATE", BONE AND MINERAL, SHANNON, IE, (1994), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 123 - 134, XP001015353 [X] 1,3,6,9,11,17 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9311786 (PROCTER & GAMBLE PHARMA [US]); | [X]WO9421266 (LEIRAS OY [FI]); | [X]WO9528936 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9639150 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9639151 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9800438 (UNIV LIVERPOOL [GB], et al); | [X] - TAXEL P., "Osteoporosis: Detection, prevention and treatment in primary care", GERIATRICS, (199808), vol. 53, no. 8, pages 22 - 40, XP002906299 | [X] - ECK J. ET AL., "Diagnosis and treatment of common metabolic spinal disorders in the geriatric population", SOUTHERN MEDICAL JOURNAL, (199812), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 1089 - 1097, XP002906300 | [X] - SABOKAR A. ET AL., "Bisphosphonates in bone cement inhibit PMMA particle induced bone resorption", ANNALS OF RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (199810), vol. 57, no. 10, pages 614 - 618, XP002953301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.57.10.614 | Examination | - ECK J. ET AL, "Diagnosis and Treatment of Common Metabolic Spinal Disorders in the Geriatric Population", SOUTHERN MEDICAL JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 1089 - 1097, XP002906300 | - SABOKBAR A. ET AL, "Bisphosphonates in bone cement inhibit PMMA particle induced bone resorption", ANNALS OF RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (1998), vol. 57, no. 10, doi:10.1136/ard.57.10.614, pages 614 - 618, XP002953301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.57.10.614 |